ME LD593 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Stabilize the Behavioral Health Workforce and Avert More Expensive Treatments
Title
Resolve, To Stabilize the Behavioral Health Workforce and Avert More Expensive Treatments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-161) thereto. |
2019-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-161) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-161) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) was READ. |
2019-05-30 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-161) thereto |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-161) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-161) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Adoption of Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-143) READ |
2019-05-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-02-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |