ME LD592 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enable the Maine Employers' Mutual Insurance Company To Better Serve Maine Employers by Eliminating the High-risk Program
Title
An Act To Enable the Maine Employers' Mutual Insurance Company To Better Serve Maine Employers by Eliminating the High-risk Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Assigned for SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-02-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |