ME LD589 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Ensure That the Maine Electric Grid Provides Additional Benefits to Maine Ratepayers
Title
An Act to Ensure That the Maine Electric Grid Provides Additional Benefits to Maine Ratepayers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-553). |
2024-03-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-553) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-553) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-553) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |