ME LD588 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-26 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-26 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Amend the Excise Tax on Motor Vehicles To Reflect Depreciation
Title
An Act To Amend the Excise Tax on Motor Vehicles To Reflect Depreciation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-06-15 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 124th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1053, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-13 | (H) Carried over to any special or regular session of the 124th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1053. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Perry of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |