ME LD587 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Contract Indemnification
Title
An Act Regarding Contract Indemnification
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Robert Nutting [R] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. John Patrick [D] |
Sen. Michael Thibodeau [R] | Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Rep. Eleanor Espling [R] |
Rep. Karleton Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #91 (Y: 89 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #74 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #74 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-05-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-27 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) |
2015-05-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-21 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-05-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 91 (Yeas 89 - Nays 60 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2015-05-21 | House | Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-05-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-20 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-20 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-05-20 | House | Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-05-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 74 20 Yeas - 14 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) Report ACCEPTED |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-03-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-03 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2015-03-03 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |