ME LD581 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Independent 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Independent 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Direct Electric Utilities To Provide Comparative Usage Data on Customer Billing Statements
Title
An Act To Direct Electric Utilities To Provide Comparative Usage Data on Customer Billing Statements
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Riseman [I] | Rep. Kent Ackley [I] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Norman Higgins [I] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-108), in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-108) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-108). |
2019-04-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |