ME LD576 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Supplemental Allocations from the Highway Fund and Other Funds for the Expenditures of State Government and To Change Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2011
Title
An Act To Make Supplemental Allocations from the Highway Fund and Other Funds for the Expenditures of State Government and To Change Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-9) | |
2011-03-24 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-03-22 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-9) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-22 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-9) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-02-15 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-02-15 | (S) On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION | |
2011-02-15 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Committee on TRANSPORTATION |