ME LD572 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Appropriate Health Insurance Coverage for Prescription Eye Drops
Title
An Act To Ensure Appropriate Health Insurance Coverage for Prescription Eye Drops
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-81), in concurrence. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-81) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-81). |
2015-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset, REFERRED to the Committee on Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence. |
2015-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |