ME LD572 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Expand the Membership of the Maine Elder Death Analysis Review Team
Title
An Act To Expand the Membership of the Maine Elder Death Analysis Review Team
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-05 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-05 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-30 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-04-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Brannigan of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |