ME LD570 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide for Fairness in the Taxation of Extraordinary and Unearned Income by Establishing a 3 Percent Surcharge on Net Capital Gains and Dividends Income over $250,000 for Taxpayers Filing Single or Married Separate Returns and over $500,000 for Taxpayers Filing Joint Returns
Title
An Act To Provide for Fairness in the Taxation of Extraordinary and Unearned Income by Establishing a 3 Percent Surcharge on Net Capital Gains and Dividends Income over $250,000 for Taxpayers Filing Single or Married Separate Returns and over $500,000 for Taxpayers Filing Joint Returns
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Barbara Cardone [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] |
Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Rep. Christopher Kessler [D] | Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-23 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-02-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 22, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=570&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0415&item=1&snum=130 |