ME LD569 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 5: Maine Disaster Recovery Fund, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Defense, Veterans and Emergency Management, Maine Emergency Management Agency
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 5: Maine Disaster Recovery Fund, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Defense, Veterans and Emergency Management, Maine Emergency Management Agency
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-20 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-04-20 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-04-18 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-16 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2017-02-16 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-02-16 | House | Representative WARREN for the Department of Defense, Veterans and Emergency Management, Maine Emergency Management Agency pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |