ME LD568 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish a Working Farmland Access and Protection Program within the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry and a Working Farmland Access and Protection Fund within the Land for Maine's Future Program
Title
An Act To Establish a Working Farmland Access and Protection Program within the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry and a Working Farmland Access and Protection Fund within the Land for Maine's Future Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-121) in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-121) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-121). |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-121) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 22, 2021. |