ME LD568 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Candidates To Be Listed as Unenrolled If Not Registered with a Recognized Party
Title
An Act To Require Candidates To Be Listed as Unenrolled If Not Registered with a Recognized Party
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Turner [R] | Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] |
Rep. Stedman Seavey [R] | Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] | Rep. Karleton Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Insist RC #142 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Recede And Concur RC #141 (Y: 69 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #121 (Y: 76 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Recede And Concur RC #141 (Y: 69 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #121 (Y: 76 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-188) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-24 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 142 (Yeas 74 - Nays 68 - Absent 7 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-24 | House | Subsequently, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 141 (Yeas 69 - Nays 73 - Absent 7 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-24 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-188) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-188) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 121 (Yeas 76 - Nays 71 - Absent 2 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-18 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |