ME LD566 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Individuals from Breaches of Trust by Clergy Members
Title
An Act To Protect Individuals from Breaches of Trust by Clergy Members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED , in concurrence. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Report READ and REJECTED |
2015-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-07 | House | On motion of Representative GUERIN of Glenburn the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2015-05-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-05 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-05 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2015-05-05 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2015-05-05 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED. |
2015-05-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence. |
2015-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=566&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0390&item=1&snum=127 |