ME LD562 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Shoreland Zoning Rules and Enforcement To Support Municipalities
Title
An Act To Improve Shoreland Zoning Rules and Enforcement To Support Municipalities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #22 (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-38), in concurrence. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-38) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2019-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARSON of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-38). |
2019-03-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-38) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 22 (Yeas 94 - Nays 48 - Absent 7 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-03-26 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-26 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |