ME LD560 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - LD 560 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 15 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - LD 560 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 15 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Patient Information Under the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Title
An Act Regarding Patient Information Under the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #391 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #399 (Y: 120 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Enactment RC #261 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #399 (Y: 120 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Enactment RC #261 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | LD 560 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 15 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2015-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 399V 120 having voted in the affirmative and 25 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 261 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-330), in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) |
2015-06-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |