ME LD56 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - LD 56 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 29 IN FAVOR and 6 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Include 50 Milliliter and Smaller Liquor Bottles in the Laws Governing Returnable Containers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Include 50 Milliliter and Smaller Liquor Bottles in the Laws Governing Returnable Containers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #238 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #235 (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt 'a' RC #140 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #79 (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-07SenateLD 56 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 29 IN FAVOR and 6 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 235V 114 having voted in the affirmative and 31 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-06-06HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-05-23SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-05-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-18HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-107) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-132) thereto in concurrence
2017-05-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-107) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-132) thereto was ADOPTED
2017-05-16SenateHouse Amendment "A" (H-132) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-107) was READ and ADOPTED
2017-05-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-107) READ
2017-05-16SenateREAD ONCE
2017-05-16SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 140 Yeas 32 - Nays 3 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-05-16SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2017-05-16SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-05-11SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-11SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2017-05-11SenateSenator SAVIELLO of Franklin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2017-05-11SenateReports READ
2017-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-09HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-107) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-132) thereto.
2017-05-09HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-05-09HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-107) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-132) thereto was ADOPTED.
2017-05-09HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, House Amendment "A" (H-132) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-107) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-09HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-107) was READ.
2017-05-09HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-05-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 79 (Yeas 111 - Nays 34 - Absent 5 - Excused 1)
2017-05-09HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-09HouseReports READ.
2017-01-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-11HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2017-01-11HouseCommittee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.
2017-01-11SenateREFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=56&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0043&item=1&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0043&item=2&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0043&item=5&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0043&item=6&snum=128
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280065282&chamber=House&serialnumber=79
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280065282&chamber=House&serialnumber=235
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280065282&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=140
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280065282&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=238

Bill Comments

feedback