ME LD556 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 191: Health Maintenance Organizations and of the Final Repeal of Chapter 750: Standardized Health Plans, Major Substantive Rules of the Department of Professional and Financial Regulation, Bureau of Insurance
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 191: Health Maintenance Organizations and of the Final Repeal of Chapter 750: Standardized Health Plans, Major Substantive Rules of the Department of Professional and Financial Regulation, Bureau of Insurance
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-04-13 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2017-02-14 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-02-14 | House | Representative LAWRENCE for the Department of Professional and Financial Regulation, Bureau of Insurance pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |