ME LD554 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Commercial Vehicles at Canadian Weight Limits Traveling to Certain Points in the State
Title
An Act Concerning Commercial Vehicles at Canadian Weight Limits Traveling to Certain Points in the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE |
2015-05-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence. |
2015-05-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-85), in concurrence. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-85) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-85). |
2015-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence. |
2015-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |