ME LD549 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Recognize Preexisting Land Uses
Title
An Act To Recognize Preexisting Land Uses
Sponsors
Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Rep. Chad Grignon [R] |
Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] | Rep. Tom Winsor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-167) in concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-167) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-167). |
2017-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |