ME LD544 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Libertarian 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Eliminate Moose Permits for Hunting Lodges

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Eliminate Moose Permits for Hunting Lodges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2021-04-13JointReported Out: ONTP
2021-04-05JointVoted: ONTP
2021-04-05JointWork Session Reconsidered
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-29JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-03-29JointWork Session Held
2021-02-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-02-22HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on February 22, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback