ME LD54 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Post-conviction Review in Order To Facilitate the Fair Hearing of All Newly Discovered Evidence
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Post-conviction Review in Order To Facilitate the Fair Hearing of All Newly Discovered Evidence
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #366 (Y: 88 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-715) in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-715) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-715) ACCEPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-715). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-715) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 366 (Yeas 88 - Nays 51 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REFFERED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2021-03-10 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-10 | House | Representative WARREN from the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Reports a recommendation for a CHANGE OF COMMITEE. |
2021-03-10 | House | Report of the Chair-Pursuant to Joint Order S.P. 9 |
2021-03-02 | Joint | Reported Out: REFER TO OTHER |
2021-03-02 | Joint | Refer Approved by Chairs/Leads: REFER TO OTHER |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |