ME LD538 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Consolidate the Department of Marine Resources and the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife into a New Department of Fish, Wildlife and Marine Resources
Title
An Act To Consolidate the Department of Marine Resources and the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife into a New Department of Fish, Wildlife and Marine Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-04-30 | (S) On motion by Senator Simpson of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) On motion of Representative BEAUDETTE of Biddeford, TABLED pending REFERENCE. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed. |