ME LD532 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Simplify the Plumbing and Heating Licensing Process
Title
An Act to Simplify the Plumbing and Heating Licensing Process
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Rep. James Boyle [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Gary Drinkwater [R] |
Rep. Rachel Henderson [R] | Sen. Peter Lyford [R] | Rep. Joseph Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-28 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-03-24 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-03-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2023-02-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=532&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0337&item=1&snum=131 |