ME LD531 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Establish the Maine Fourth Amendment Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Establish the Maine Fourth Amendment Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #291 (Y: 82 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #282 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2015-06-23HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-23HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-275).
2015-06-18SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2015-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
2015-06-18HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-18HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2015-06-18HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-275).
2015-06-18HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2015-06-18HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-275) was READ and ADOPTED.
2015-06-18HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2015-06-18HouseROLL CALL NO. 291 (Yeas 82 - Nays 58 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
2015-06-18HouseOn motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2015-06-18HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2015-06-18HouseLater today assigned.
2015-06-18HouseOn motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2015-06-18HouseReports READ.
2015-06-17SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2015-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call # 282 25 Yeas - 9 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
2015-06-17SenateSubsequently, On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
2015-06-17SenateTaken from the table by the President ProTem
2015-06-17SenateOn motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report
2015-06-17SenateSenator BURNS of Washington moved to to ACCEPT Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report
2015-06-17SenateReports READ
2015-03-03HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-03-03HouseBill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2015-02-26SenateSent down for concurrence.
2015-02-26SenateOn motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
2015-02-26Senatesuggested and ordered printed
2015-02-26SenateCommittee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback