ME LD529 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Resiliency of the Maine Electrical Grid
Title
An Act To Ensure Resiliency of the Maine Electrical Grid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #96 (Y: 76 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #39 (Y: 73 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #39 (Y: 73 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2017-05-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 96V 76 having voted in the affirmative and 69 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 2 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-05-16 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-05-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-45), in concurrence. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-45) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-04-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-45). |
2017-04-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-45) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-04-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-04-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 39 (Yeas 73 - Nays 62 - Absent 15 - Excused 1) |
2017-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |