ME LD528 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Advance Energy Storage in Maine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Advance Energy Storage in Maine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #381 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-16HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-314).
2021-06-16HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-16HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-314) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-16HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-16HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-16HouseReports READ.
2021-06-15SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-15SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-314)
2021-06-15SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-314) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-15SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-15JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-06-15SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 381 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2021-06-15SenateReports READ
2021-06-04JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-06-04JointWork Session Held
2021-06-01JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-23JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on February 22, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback