ME LD527 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Bureau of Parks and Lands To Establish a Law Enforcement Training Program for Park Managers and Certain Bureau Staff
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Bureau of Parks and Lands To Establish a Law Enforcement Training Program for Park Managers and Certain Bureau Staff
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-229), in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-229) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-229). |
2019-05-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |