ME LD523 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Review the Laws Governing Domestic Violence
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Review the Laws Governing Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] |
Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2017-06-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-362) in concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-362) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-01 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-362). |
2017-06-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-362) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |