ME LD521 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Change the Budget Approval Process for Alternative Organizational Structures
Title
An Act To Change the Budget Approval Process for Alternative Organizational Structures
Sponsors
Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Sen. James Hamper [R] | Rep. Dale Crafts [R] |
Rep. Joyce Fitzpatrick [R] | Rep. Jeffery Gifford [R] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #73 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-05-15 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-05-15 | Senate | (S.P. 211) (L.D. 521) An Act to Change the Budget Aproval Process for Alternative Organizational Structures In Senate, May 15, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 23 and 12, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-04-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |