ME LD52 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exempt Certain Veterans from Hunter Safety Courses
Title
An Act To Exempt Certain Veterans from Hunter Safety Courses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-02 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-53). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-53). |
2017-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-53) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-04-25 | House | On motion of Representative DUCHESNE of Hudson, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | in concurrence |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE |
2017-01-11 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE |
2017-01-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2017-01-10 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=52&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0038&item=1&snum=128 |