ME LD52 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-17 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-17 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Require Unredeemed Beverage Container Deposits To Be Provided to the State
Title
An Act To Require Unredeemed Beverage Container Deposits To Be Provided to the State
Sponsors
Rep. John Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator SCHNEIDER of Penobscot Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) On motion of Representative MARTIN of Eagle Lake the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-15 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-13 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-01-07 | (H) On motion of Representative SMITH of Monmouth, TABLED pending REFERENCE. | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Committee on BUSINESS, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed. |