ME LD516 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - LD 516 In Senate, May 20, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 in Favor and 6 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - LD 516 In Senate, May 20, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 in Favor and 6 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Gaming
Title
An Act Regarding Gaming
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Luchini [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Rep. Kimberly Monaghan-Derrig [D] |
Rep. Robert Saucier [D] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #80 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #71 (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #10 (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #71 (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #10 (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | LD 516 In Senate, May 20, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 in Favor and 6 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. , in concurrence. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2015-05-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 71V 119 having voted in the affirmative and 27 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-05-13 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-04-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-24), in concurrence. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-24) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Subsequently, Report Accepted , in concurrence. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reports READ On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-24) Report , in concurrence. Unfinished Business |
2015-04-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-24). |
2015-04-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-24) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-04-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-04-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 10 (Yeas 141 - Nays 8 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2015-04-01 | House | Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-01 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-03-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-31 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2015-03-31 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2015-03-31 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester REMOVED. |
2015-03-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cyrway of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs, in concurrence. |
2015-02-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |