ME LD516 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Maine Law Regarding Employment Practices for Certain Minors
Title
An Act To Amend Maine Law Regarding Employment Practices for Certain Minors
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Sen. Debra Plowman [R] | Sen. Christopher Rector [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Schneider [D] | Sen. Douglas Thomas [R] | Sen. Amy Volk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-97) thereto. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-97) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Subsequently, Senate Amendment "C" (S-97) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Subsequently, Representative TUTTLE of Sanford WITHDREW his motion to INDEFINITLEY POSTONE the Bill and accompanying papers. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Subsequently, Representative TUTTLE of Sanford WITHDREW his motion to TABLE until later in today's session. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) The same Representative MOVED that the Bill be TABLED until later in today's session. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Representative TUTTLE of Sanford MOVED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 60 (Yeas 70 - Nays 75 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-05-18 | (H) On motion of Representative HUNT of Buxton, House Amendment "B" (H-257) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) was READ and FAILED ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) was READ. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 59 (Yeas 78 - Nays 69 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-05-18 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-05-12 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "C" (S-97) thereto Sent down for concurrence | |
2011-05-12 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) As Amended By Senate Amendment "C" (S-97) thereto ADOPTED | |
2011-05-12 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "C" (S-97) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) READ and ADOPTED (Remarks Made) | |
2011-05-12 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator SULLIVAN of York RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) | |
2011-05-11 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME On motion by Senator PLOWMAN of Penobscot Tabled Later Today Assigned pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-10 | (S) 21 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2011-05-10 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY Roll Call # 52 | |
2011-05-10 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-10 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-05-10 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator RECTOR of Knox Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-79) Report ACCEPTED. Remarks Made. On motion by Jackson of Aroostook, Roll Call Ordered. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-02-15 | (S) On motion by Senator Rector of Knox REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT | |
2011-02-15 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |