ME LD511 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement the National Popular Vote for President
Title
An Act To Implement the National Popular Vote for President
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Woodbury [D] | Rep. Joseph Brooks [D] | Rep. James Campbell [R] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - Acc Min Ought To Pass Rep RC #626 (Y: 60 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Ptbe RC #523 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Accept Min Otp Rpt RC #518 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Ptbe RC #523 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Accept Min Otp Rpt RC #518 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2014-04-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-03 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 626 (Yeas 60 - Nays 85 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-03 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Minority Ought to Pass Report FAILED. |
2014-04-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 523 17 Yeas - 17 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME |
2014-04-01 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator KATZ of Kennebec objected to Suspension of the rules for the purpose of giving the bill a second reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 518 17 Yeas - 16 Nays- 2 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2014-04-01 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2014-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-05 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2014-03-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York, Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs. Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-02-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |