ME LD504 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Certification for Certain Mental Health Rehabilitation Technicians
Title
Resolve, Regarding Certification for Certain Mental Health Rehabilitation Technicians
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Sachs [D] | Rep. Poppy Arford [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] |
Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Rep. Erin Sheehan [D] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-151), in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-151). |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-05-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-17 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-17 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 17, 2021. |