ME LD503 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Continue the Doctors for Maine's Future Scholarship Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Continue the Doctors for Maine's Future Scholarship Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #324 (Y: 86 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2017-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-31).
2017-06-16HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-16HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-31) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-16HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-16HouseROLL CALL NO. 324 (Yeas 86 - Nays 62 - Absent 3 - Excused 0)
2017-06-16HouseOn motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-16HouseReports READ.
2017-06-15SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-15SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-31)
2017-06-15SenateTaken from the table by the President ProTem
2017-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-13SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-12SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-09SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-08SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-01SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-31SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-30SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-25SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-24SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-23SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-18SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-17SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-16SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-11SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-09SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-04SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-02SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-27SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-25SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-20SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-20SenateOn motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-31)
2017-04-20SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2017-04-19SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2017-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-31) READ and ADOPTED
2017-04-19SenateREAD ONCE
2017-04-19SenateOn motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-04-19SenateReports Read
2017-02-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
2017-02-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-02-14SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
2017-02-14SenateCommittee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback