ME LD5 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Limit on the Number of Patients a Primary Caregiver May Provide for under the Medical Marijuana Laws
Title
An Act To Increase the Limit on the Number of Patients a Primary Caregiver May Provide for under the Medical Marijuana Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Enactment RC #292 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-18 - House - Enactment RC #295 (Y: 68 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #282 (Y: 73 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Enactment RC #295 (Y: 68 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #282 (Y: 73 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 292 12 Yeas - 23 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2015-06-18 | Senate | FAILED ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 295 (Yeas 68 - Nays 75 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-18 | House | PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED FAILED. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-456) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-456) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-456). |
2015-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-456) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 282 (Yeas 73 - Nays 72 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-01-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-01-07 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |