ME LD5 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Changes to the Potato Marketing Improvement Fund
Title
An Act To Make Changes to the Potato Marketing Improvement Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Alexander Willette [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Roger Sherman [R] | Sen. Russell Black [R] |
Rep. Dean Cray [R] | Rep. Ricky Long [R] | Rep. Carol McElwee [R] | Rep. Robert Saucier [D] |
Rep. Thomas Tyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) READ and ADOPTED thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-198), in concurrence. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-198) |
2013-05-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-01-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-01-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |