ME LD494 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Change the Schedule for Redistricting
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Change the Schedule for Redistricting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2011-06-16 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-16 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-06-15 | (S) AND House Amendment "B" (H-565) | |
2011-06-15 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator THOMAS of Somerset The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) | |
2011-06-13 | (S) On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Tabled Later Today Assigned pending further consideration Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-10 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-10 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2011-06-10 | (H) RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) and House Amendment "B" (H-565). | |
2011-06-10 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "B" (H-565) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-06-10 | (H) On motion of Representative KESCHL of Belgrade, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-76). | |
2011-06-09 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) in concurrence | |
2011-04-26 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator THOMAS of Somerset Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) | |
2011-04-13 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) On motion of Representative COTTA of China, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) On motion by Senator Thomas of Somerset, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |