ME LD491 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Extend the Allowed Time for the Interchange of Educators between School Administrative Units and the Department of Education
Title
An Act To Extend the Allowed Time for the Interchange of Educators between School Administrative Units and the Department of Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-65), in concurrence. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-65) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-65). |
2017-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |