ME LD49 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing the Issuance on Request of Acquired Brain Injury Identification Cards
Title
An Act Authorizing the Issuance on Request of Acquired Brain Injury Identification Cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-360) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-360) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-360) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-360) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-519), in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519). |
2019-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-01-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |