ME LD49 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Science and Engineering Education for Maine's Students
Title
An Act To Improve Science and Engineering Education for Maine's Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #337 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #319 (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #319 (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2017-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-497) in concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-497) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 337 Yeas 34 - Nays 1 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-497) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock to ACCEPT The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-497) in concurrence Roll Call Ordered |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Senator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to Accept The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-497) in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-497). |
2017-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-497) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 319 (Yeas 85 - Nays 53 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Any Report. |
2017-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | in concurrence |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2017-01-11 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2017-01-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-01-10 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |