ME LD489 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish a Right to a Healthy Environment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish a Right to a Healthy Environment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #44 (Y: 82 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-09-29HouseUnfinished Business
2021-07-19HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-07-19HouseUnfinished Business
2021-07-02HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-30HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-17HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-15HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-14HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-09HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-08HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-07HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-03HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-02HouseUnfinished Business
2021-05-19HouseUnfinished Business
2021-05-19HouseLater today assigned.
2021-05-19HouseOn motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2021-04-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-04-28HouseThe RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-53).
2021-04-28HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-04-28HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-53) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-04-28HouseThe RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
2021-04-28HouseROLL CALL NO. 44 (Yeas 82 - Nays 49 - Absent 20 - Excused 0)
2021-04-28HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-04-28HouseReports READ.
2021-04-28SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-04-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-53)
2021-04-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-53) READ and ADOPTED
2021-04-28SenateREAD ONCE
2021-04-28SenateOn motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2021-04-28SenateReports READ
2021-04-21JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-17JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-03-17JointWork Session Held
2021-02-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on February 17, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback