ME LD486 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Directing the Bureau of Parks and Lands To Convey Certain Land in Township 12, Range 13 WELS in Exchange for Other Land in Township 11, Range 10 WELS

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Directing the Bureau of Parks and Lands To Convey Certain Land in Township 12, Range 13 WELS in Exchange for Other Land in Township 11, Range 10 WELS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-23JointVoted: OTP-AM
2021-03-23JointWork Session Held
2021-02-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on February 17, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback