ME LD484 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to the Housing Opportunities for Maine Fund
Title
An Act Relating to the Housing Opportunities for Maine Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Accept Report RC #740 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-537) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-593) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-537) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-593) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-537) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-593) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-593) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-537) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-537) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-537) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-537). |
2022-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-537) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-537) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 740 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2022-04-11 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-17 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 17, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |