ME LD483 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Enforcement of Snowmobile Noise Levels
Title
An Act To Improve Enforcement of Snowmobile Noise Levels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-48), in concurrence. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-48) in concurrence |
2017-04-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-48) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-48). |
2017-04-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |