ME LD480 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Clarify Laws Regarding the Placement of Signs on Public Ways
Title
An Act to Clarify Laws Regarding the Placement of Signs on Public Ways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-13 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2023-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |