ME LD480 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prioritize Access by Maine's Most Vulnerable Citizens to Welfare Resources
Title
An Act To Prioritize Access by Maine's Most Vulnerable Citizens to Welfare Resources
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] |
Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-09 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #269 (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #264 (Y: 77 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #264 (Y: 77 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 269 Yeas 10 - Nays 25 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . FAILED |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 264 (Yeas 77 - Nays 70 - Absent 3 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |