ME LD477 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Relief to Federal Employees Affected by a Federal Shutdown
Title
An Act To Provide Relief to Federal Employees Affected by a Federal Shutdown
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #8 (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 8 (Yeas 92 - Nays 46 - Absent 10 - Excused 1 Vacant 2) |
2019-03-07 | House | FAILED ENACTMENT. |
2019-03-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-1). |
2019-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-1) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-05 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-1) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-1) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-02-26 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Report READ |
2019-01-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |